IL HB4828 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person serving a sentence for any criminal offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance for which the statutory penalty has been subsequently reduced or altered may petition the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction to request resentencing or dismissal in accordance with the statutory penalty in effect at the time of the filing of the petition. Provides that upon verified petition for resentencing by the defendant, the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction in a defendant's case may order resentencing at any time after 30 days have passed following the imposition of a sentence under a guilty verdict or a finding of guilt for any criminal offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance provided: (1) the State's Attorney or other prosecuting attorney is given at least 30-day notice of the filing of the petition seeking resentencing; (2) the statutory penalty for the offense for which the defendant was found guilty or convicted, since his or her plea of guilty or conviction, has been subsequently reduced or altered in a manner that includes, but is not limited to: (A) reducing the minimum or maximum sentence for the offense; (B) granting the court more discretion over the range of penalties available for the offense; or (C) changing the penalties associated with the offense or conduct underlying the offense in any way.
Title
CRIM PRO-PENALTY REDUCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |