IL HB4828 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person serving a sentence for any criminal offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance for which the statutory penalty has been subsequently reduced or altered may petition the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction to request resentencing or dismissal in accordance with the statutory penalty in effect at the time of the filing of the petition. Provides that upon verified petition for resentencing by the defendant, the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction in a defendant's case may order resentencing at any time after 30 days have passed following the imposition of a sentence under a guilty verdict or a finding of guilt for any criminal offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance provided: (1) the State's Attorney or other prosecuting attorney is given at least 30-day notice of the filing of the petition seeking resentencing; (2) the statutory penalty for the offense for which the defendant was found guilty or convicted, since his or her plea of guilty or conviction, has been subsequently reduced or altered in a manner that includes, but is not limited to: (A) reducing the minimum or maximum sentence for the offense; (B) granting the court more discretion over the range of penalties available for the offense; or (C) changing the penalties associated with the offense or conduct underlying the offense in any way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-PENALTY REDUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255116-2.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback