IL HB4821 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no individual or group policy of accident and health insurance amended, issued, delivered, or renewed in the State after the effective date of the amendatory Act that covers the treatment of stage 4 advanced, metastatic cancer shall limit or exclude coverage for a drug by mandating that the insured shall first be required to fail to successfully respond to a different drug or prove a history of failure of the drug unless the use of the drug is consistent with best practices for the treatment of stage 4 advanced, metastatic cancer and is supported by peer-reviewed medical literature. Makes conforming changes in the State Employee Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CODE-STAGE 4 CANCER DRUGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1057
2018-08-24HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-24HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-001
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 012-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-000-000
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 012-001-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 011-001-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
2151304003Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.29New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-16.8Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4821&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4821.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4821eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4821enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1057.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4821ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4821sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4821_04272018_064000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4821_05242018_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4821sam001_05312018_067000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback