IL HB4821 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no individual or group policy of accident and health insurance amended, issued, delivered, or renewed in the State after the effective date of the amendatory Act that covers the treatment of stage 4 advanced, metastatic cancer shall limit or exclude coverage for a drug by mandating that the insured shall first be required to fail to successfully respond to a different drug or prove a history of failure of the drug unless the use of the drug is consistent with best practices for the treatment of stage 4 advanced, metastatic cancer and is supported by peer-reviewed medical literature. Makes conforming changes in the State Employee Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS CODE-STAGE 4 CANCER DRUGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1057 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-001 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 012-001-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 011-001-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |