IL HB4818 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that a municipality that has not extended property taxes for any purpose for a continuous 5-year period immediately preceding the tax year of the initial levy may establish an initial levy without resort to referendum, but not to exceed an aggregate rate of 0.25% and further subject to the Truth in Taxation Law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-INITIAL LEVY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520018-210Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback