IL HB4815 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Removes language providing that a collaborating physician may collaborate with a maximum of 5 full-time equivalent physician assistants. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, removes language providing that a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches may enter into collaborative agreements with no more than 5 full-time equivalent physician assistants except in a hospital, hospital affiliate, or ambulatory surgical treatment center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256054.5Amended CodeCitation Text
225957Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback