IL HB4815 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987 and the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Removes language providing that a collaborating physician may collaborate with a maximum of 5 full-time equivalent physician assistants.
Title
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 54.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4815&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4815.htm |