IL HB4814 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a person who first becomes a firefighter under the Article on or after January 1, 2011 and who is not receiving a disability pension under specified provisions dies for specified reasons, then a pension shall be paid to his or her survivors in the amount equal to the greater of (i) 54% of the firefighter's monthly salary at the date of death, or (ii) 66 2/3% of the firefighter's earned pension at the date of death (rather than the amount of 66 2/3% of the firefighter's earned pension at the date of death). Provides that the changes apply without regard to whether the deceased firefighter was in service on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-DNST FIRE-TIER 2

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-114Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback