IL HB4811 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that the term "official" as used under the Act includes specified officials of a unit of local government. Modifies the terms "lobby" and "lobbying" to include communications with units of local government for the ultimate purpose of influencing any executive, legislative, or administrative action, and further specifies such actions. Modifies the term "lobbyist" to mean a natural person who, on behalf of any person other than himself or herself, or as any part of his or her duties as an employee of another, undertakes to influence or lobby for any executive, legislative, or administrative action for State government or a unit of local government. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act to provide that no legislator may engage in lobbying as that term is defined under the Lobbyist Registration Act (currently, as defined under the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act) for compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOV ETHICS-LOCAL GOVT LOBBYING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2020-07-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2020-07-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2020-07-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2020-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2020-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251702Amended CodeCitation Text
54202-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback