IL HB4809 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Contract Fraud Act. Provides that the Attorney General need not approve the title for lands needed for public works or improvements if the consideration paid does not exceed $25,000 (currently, $10,000). Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-PUBLIC WORKS-LAND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 545 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |