IL HB4809 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that any (i) member of the General Assembly, (ii) person whose appointment to office is subject to the advice and consent of the Senate, or (iii) head of a department, commission, board, division, bureau, authority, or other administrative unit within the government of this State who takes office on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall not, within a 3-year period immediately following termination of that person's most recent term of office, register as a lobbyist and engage in lobbying with members of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-LOBBYING RESTRICTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2020-07-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2020-07-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2020-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2020-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54305-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback