IL HB4808 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Changes the definition of "recurrent requester" to exclude requests made by members of the General Assembly and requests made to access and disseminate information pertaining to public policy and the administration of State government. Exempts from disclosure under the Act certain records in which opinions of a public body or its agents are expressed. Provides that the exemption does not apply if the records were produced in connection with the preparation of a report that is required to be publicly produced by an agency of the executive branch. Provides that the public body shall include with each denial of a request for public records an index that includes specified information. Provides that except in the case of a recurrent requester, a public body denying a request for public records shall place in an interest-bearing escrow account or other segregated account of the public body the sum of $7,500 for each request denied. Provides that the deposited funds shall remain in the account for a period of 60 days after the date of the public body's final denial of a request, or, if a requester has sought review of the denial or challenged the denial in court, until the review process has been completed or a final order has been entered. Provides that if a determination is made that the public body improperly denied a request to inspect or copy a public record, the deposited funds shall be awarded to the requester in addition to or as part of any other award. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-PENALTIES-RECORDS-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2020-07-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2020-07-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2020-07-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2020-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
514011Amended CodeCitation Text
51402Amended CodeCitation Text
51407Amended CodeCitation Text
51409Amended CodeCitation Text
51409.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback