IL HB4801 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the legislative purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013051-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback