IL HB4800 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that surplus tax revenues may be used to pay for costs of special education, social services, and other costs of a public school district. Provides that for municipalities with a population of over 1,000,000, redevelopment project costs include public school district qualified workers, costs of providing special educational facilities and services, school psychological services, and school social work services, and any surplus balance in the special tax allocation fund at the end of the fiscal year shall be used for these workers, facilities, and services. Removes provisions allowing anticipated redevelopment project costs to be deemed surplus funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-SURPLUS FUNDS-SCHOOLS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-04-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-23HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-2Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-3Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-5Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-7Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-8Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.4-8aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback