IL HB4799 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, in every public school maintaining any of grades kindergarten through 8, there shall be instruction, study, and discussion of effective methods for the prevention and avoidance of traffic injuries related to walking and bicycling. Provides that if a school board provides instruction on safety education under a provision in the Code, the instruction shall include pedestrian and bicycling safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PEDESTRIAN&BIKE SAFETY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1056
2018-08-24HouseEffective Date August 24, 2018
2018-08-24HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-011-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-003-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-013-000
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-003-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-13.2Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4799&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4799.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4799eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4799enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1056.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4799ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4799sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4799_04252018_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4799_05242018_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4799sam001_05312018_066000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback