IL HB4799 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, in every public school maintaining any of grades kindergarten through 8, there shall be instruction, study, and discussion of effective methods for the prevention and avoidance of traffic injuries related to walking and bicycling. Provides that if a school board provides instruction on safety education under a provision in the Code, the instruction shall include pedestrian and bicycling safety.
Title
SCH CD-PEDESTRIAN&BIKE SAFETY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1056 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-011-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-003-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-013-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-003-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-13.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |