IL HB4797 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall progressively increase rates and reimbursements so that by July 1, 2018 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $5.25 per hour above the highest of the federal, State, county, or municipal minimum wages, and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage, and by July 1, 2020 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $6.75 per hour above the highest of the federal, State, county, or municipal minimum wages. Effective immediately.
Title
DEV DISABILITIES WORKERS-WAGES
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4j | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4797&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4797.htm |