IL HB4796 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986 and the Protective Orders Article of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. To the list of protected persons, adds any of the following persons abused by a family or household member of a child: (1) a foster parent of that child if the child has been placed in the foster parent's home by the Department of Children and Family Services or by another state's public child welfare agency; (2) a legally appointed guardian or legally appointed custodian of that child; (3) an adoptive parent of that child; or (4) a prospective adoptive parent of that child if the child has been placed in the prospective adoptive parent's home pursuant to the Adoption Act or pursuant to another state's law. Includes these persons in the list of persons permitted to file a petition for an order of protection. Provides that, for purposes of the provisions of the amendatory Act, individuals who would have been considered "family or household members" of the child before a termination of the parental rights with respect to the child continue to meet the definition of "family or household members" of the child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ORDER PROTECT-ADOPTION/FOSTER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-001
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255112A-4Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-4.5Amended CodeCitation Text
75060201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback