IL HB4791 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a person shall not be appointed as the chief, the acting chief, the department head, or a position, by whatever title, that is responsible for day-to-day operations of a fire department or fire protection district for greater than 180 days unless he or she possesses certification that meets the National Fire Protection Association's NFPA 1001, Standard for Fire Fighter Professional Qualifications, Fire Fighter II job performance requirements; certification that meets the National Fire Protection Association's NFPA 1021, Standard for Fire Officer Professional Qualifications, Fire Officer II job performance requirements (rather than Office of the State Fire Marshal Firefighter Basic Certification or Firefighter II Certification; Office of the State Fire Marshal Fire Officer I and II Certifications).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPOINTMENT OF FIRE CHIEFS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Carol Sente
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65510-1-7.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-2.1-4Amended CodeCitation Text
7070516.04bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback