IL HB4790 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Compost-Amended Soil Construction Act. Provides that any State agency that undertakes a construction project that requires the use of offsite soil and that is located within 20 miles of any Illinois Environmental Protection Agency-permitted compost facility shall request a separate bid for compost-amended soil for that project. Provides that the State agency shall consider whether compost-amended soil shall be used based upon the construction cost. Provides that the State agency shall incorporate compost-amended soil into a construction project if the State agency deems the use of compost-amended soil to be appropriate. Provides that, in the 2019 calendar year, the Department of Transportation shall conduct 2 pilot road construction demonstrations using compost-amended soil. Provides that within one year of substantial completion of both projects, the Department shall report to the General Assembly stating the immediate cost of construction, long term operational cost savings, and advantages and disadvantages of using compost-amended soil.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPOST SOIL CONSTRUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback