IL HB4789 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the program of health benefits for persons in the service of the State, a self-insuring county, or a self-insuring municipality may not deny a claim from a medical facility operated by the Veterans Health Administration of the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs on the basis that the medical facility is an out-of-network provider and may not impose a deductible, coinsurance, copayment, or any other cost-sharing requirement on a claim from a medical facility operated by the Veterans Health Administration of the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs unless cost sharing is applied to such a claim from an in-network provider. Amends the Network Adequacy and Transparency Act. Provides that an insurer providing a network plan may not deny a claim from a medical facility operated by the Veterans Health Administration on the basis that the medical facility is a non-preferred provider and may not impose a deductible, coinsurance, copayment, or any other cost-sharing requirement on a claim from a medical facility operated by the Veterans Health Administration unless cost sharing is applied to such a claim from a preferred provider. Defines "Veterans Health Administration".
Title
INS-HEALTH CARE FOR VETERANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | To Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 124 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 124 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4789&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4789.htm |