IL HB4789 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 020-066-003
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes changes with regard to the limitation of administrative costs. Defines "consumer price index", "expenditures per pupil", "general administration expenditures", and "school administration expenditures". Provides that for each school year, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, each school district shall undertake budgetary and expenditure control actions so that the increase in each of administrative expenditures (with the exception of the Chicago school district, whose limit is not changed), general administration expenditures, and school administration expenditures per pupil for that school year over the prior school year does not exceed the percentage increase, if any, in the consumer price index for the 12 months ending on the previous December 31 or 5%, whichever one is less. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ADMIN COST LIMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 20 N: 66 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Lost 020-066-003
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105517-1.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-43.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback