IL HB4783 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Provides that an association or other entity that has, as one of its purposes, promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among schools and students within this State shall prohibit a member school from using a Native American logo or mascot or any other Native American imagery unless the school (1) has received the express written consent of a Native American tribe based within 500 miles of the school, which consent must be renewed every 5 years; (2) conducts a school-wide program on Native American culture at least twice per school year; (3) offers a course of study to its students outlining Native American contributions to society; and (4) files an annual report with the State Board of Education detailing what academic programs on Native Americans it has offered during the school year. Provides that the association or other entity shall investigate any failure to comply with this prohibition and the penalty for noncompliance shall be ineligibility to participate in any playoffs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL-NATIVE AMERICAN IMAGERY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2020-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2020-03-04HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-008-000
2020-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2020-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105251.25New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback