IL HB4783 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Defines "youth". Combines the Youth Hunting License and the Youth Trapping License to create a Youth Hunting and Trapping License. Provides that before any youth may take or attempt to take any species protected by the Code for which an open season is established, he or she shall first procure and possess a valid Youth Hunting and Trapping License for a fee of $7. Provides that a Youth Hunting and Trapping License shall entitle the licensee to hunt while supervised by an adult who is 21 years of age or older and who has a valid Illinois hunting license. Provides that if a youth has a valid certificate of competency for hunting or trapping from a hunter safety course or a trapper safety course approved by the Department of Natural Resources, he or she is exempt from the supervision requirements for youth hunters or youth trappers under the provision. Makes conforming changes.
Title
WILDLIFE-YOUTH HUNT & TRAP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0638 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.2v-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |