IL HB4781 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. Requires a public college or university to use its best efforts to hire a veteran of the armed services as the Coordinator of Veterans and Military Personnel Student Services. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-VETERANS SERVICE ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1007
2018-08-21HouseEffective Date August 21, 2018
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 103-002-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-30HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose
2018-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1104915Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4781&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4781.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4781eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4781enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1007.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4781sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4781sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4781_04272018_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4781_05302018_046000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4781sam002_05312018_065000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback