IL HB4781 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. Requires a public college or university to use its best efforts to hire a veteran of the armed services as the Coordinator of Veterans and Military Personnel Student Services. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-VETERANS SERVICE ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1104915Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback