IL HB4781 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. Requires a public college or university to use its best efforts to hire a veteran of the armed services as the Coordinator of Veterans and Military Personnel Student Services. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-VETERANS SERVICE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1007 |
2018-08-21 | House | Effective Date August 21, 2018 |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 103-002-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-30 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 49 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |