IL HB4776 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Removes language concerning impasse procedures involving an educational employer whose territorial boundaries are coterminous with those of a city having a population in excess of 500,000. Repeals provisions concerning subjects of collective bargaining with that educational employer. Amends the School Code to make corresponding changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDU EMPLOYEE-IMPASSE PROCEDURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-19HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-012-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105534-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text
115512Amended CodeCitation Text
11554.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback