IL HB4774 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 042-046-008
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. In provisions regarding determination of the lowest responsible bidder in purchases by a county with fewer than 2,000,000 inhabitants for services, materials, and equipment, a local company that bids within 5% to 10% of the lowest bid, if that lowest bid is made by a non-local company, is the lowest responsible bidder. Provides that if more than one local company's bid is within 5% to 10% of the lowest bid made by a non-local company, the county board shall award the contract to the lowest responsible bidder among the local company bids. Defines "local company" as a company or business entity located within the contracting county or any contiguous county in the State that has the majority of its regular, full-time workforce located within the contracting county or contiguous county. Amends the Township Code. Makes similar changes in provisions concerning construction contracts and contracts for services, materials, equipment, or supplies. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes similar changes in provisions concerning purchasing and public works contracts in municipalities of less than 500,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL-LOWEST RESPONSIBLE BID

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 42 N: 46 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 042-046-008
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 004-003-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-1022Amended CodeCitation Text
601205-105Amended CodeCitation Text
60185-30Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-9-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback