IL HB4773 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Concerning any writing, record, photograph, or x-ray of any hospital or public or private agency made as a memorandum or record of any condition, act, transaction, occurrence or event relating to a minor in an abuse, neglect, or dependency proceeding, a certification by a person or persons employed by the hospital or agency that the writing, record, photograph, or x-ray (rather than certification by the head or responsible employee of the hospital or agency) is the full and complete record of the condition, act, transaction, occurrence or event and that it satisfies the conditions of this provision shall be prima facie evidence of the facts contained in such certification. Deletes provision that a certification by someone other than the head of the hospital or agency shall be accompanied by a photocopy of a delegation of authority signed by both the head of the hospital or agency and by such other employee.
Title
JUV CT-MEDICAL RECORDS
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Michael Kelly [D] |
Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 2-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |