IL HB4770 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the tax due for property that has been granted a senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption shall not exceed the tax liability for the property in the base year. Provides that the tax collected from that property shall be distributed to the individual taxing districts on a pro rata basis in accordance with each taxing district's proportionate share of the property's total tax liability. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4770&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4770.htm |