IL HB4768 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Adds to the oath of office required of a school board member before taking his or her seat on the board.
Title
SCH CD-SCH BOARD MEMBER-OATH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1055 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 105-003-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 105-003-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Holmes |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Education |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Education |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Education |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-05-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-004-001 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-002-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |