IL HB4768 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Adds to the oath of office required of a school board member before taking his or her seat on the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCH BOARD MEMBER-OATH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Education
2018-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Education
2018-05-10SenateRe-referred to Education
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-004-001
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-002-000
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-16.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback