IL HB4763 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers with respect to regulating motor vehicles driving on the right side of a roadway in a manner inconsistent with State law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIGHT SIDE DRIVING-HOME RULE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseRemains in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-10HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 004-005-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback