IL HB4760 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that upon the filing of an eviction action, the clerk of the circuit court shall immediately seal the court file and mail a specified notice to the defendants in the action. Provides that the clerk shall unseal the file after 30 days after the entry of an eviction order under specified circumstances. Provides that unsealed files shall be re-sealed no later than 5 years after the eviction action was filed or by order of the court. Restricts access to a sealed court record to specified persons. Provides that the clerk of the circuit court shall maintain a record in the aggregate of the number of for-cause and not-for-cause eviction actions, and a count of the final dispositions of for-cause and not-for-cause eviction actions. Restricts the dissemination of any information contained in a sealed court file and provides that certain violations of the restrictions constitute an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes a corresponding change in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EVICTIONS-SEAL COURT RECORD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-23HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-02HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-28HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73559-121Amended CodeCitation Text
73559-122New CodeSee Bill Text
8155052ZAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback