IL HB4757 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0678
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0678
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Promotion Act. Provides that moneys that are required to be deposited into the Tourism Promotion Fund from the proceeds of the tax imposed under the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act shall be deposited directly into the Tourism Promotion Fund. Provides that, if the available proceeds from the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act after certain other deposits have been made is less than the amount required to be deposited into the Tourism Promotion Fund, then the amount of the deficiency shall be transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Tourism Promotion Fund in the next calendar month. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes changes concerning grants from the Local Tourism Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-TOURISM PROMOTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0678 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 46.6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |