IL HB4754 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that unless prohibited by federal law, upon the death of a designated beneficiary, proceeds from an ABLE account may be transferred to the estate of a designated beneficiary, or to an account for another eligible individual specified by the designated beneficiary or the estate of the designated beneficiary. Provides that an agency or instrumentality of the State may not seek payment under specified provisions of the federal Internal Revenue Code from the account or its proceeds for benefits provided to a designated beneficiary. Effective immediately.
Title
ABLE ACCT PROG-ASSET PROTECT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-03-07 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-02-28 | House | To Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |