IL HB4752 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a settlement agreement in an action for damages for personal injury based on childhood sexual abuse shall not include the following: (1) a confidentiality provision binding on the person abused; or (2) a non-disparagement provision binding on the person abused.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SETTLEMENT-NONDISCLOSURE ORDER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-23HouseTo Tort Liability Law Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-2302New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback