IL HB4751 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies and reorganizes the provisions of a Section concerning the College Savings Pool. Provides that the State Treasurer may establish and administer a College Savings Pool as a qualified tuition program under the Internal Revenue Code, and that the Pool may consist of one or more college savings programs. Provides that the State Treasurer, in administering the College Savings Pool, may receive, hold, and invest moneys paid into the Pool and perform such other actions as are necessary to ensure that the Pool operates as a qualified tuition program under the Internal Revenue Code. Provides provisions concerning administration, availability, fees, and investment restrictions of the Pool. Modifies the way in which investments, distributions, contributions, and bonds are made regarding the Pool. Defines terms. Makes conforming, technical, and other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 107-003-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-014-000
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4751&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4751.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4751eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4751enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4751ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4751sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4751sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4751_04112018_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4751_05242018_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4751sam002_05312018_062000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback