IL HB4750 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an impounded vehicle can be released to a lessor of record. Provides that notice shall be given by the towing company to the lienholder of record, or, if the lessor's information is reasonably available, the lessor of the vehicle. Provides that a lienholder or lessor shall be entitled to take possession of a vehicle impounded and defer payment of any applicable administrative fees upon submission by the lienholder or lessor to the municipality or its designated agent proof of ownership of the vehicle or proof of the right to possession of the vehicle. Provides that, except for municipalities with 1,000,000 or more inhabitants with a local ordinance, no vehicle shall be released to the lienholder or lessor until payment of the authorized towing and storage fees charged by the person, firm, or entity that tows and stores the impounded vehicle and the cost of certified mail sent as required. Provides that upon the request of a lienholder or lessor to obtain possession of a vehicle impounded under any ordinance, the municipality or its agent shall provide to the lienholder or lessor an opportunity to view the vehicle within 2 business days of the request and provide a statement in writing setting forth the amount of the applicable administrative, towing, and storage fees. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-IMPOUNDED VEHICLES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-03-08HouseTo Special Issues- Subcommittee
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback