IL HB4748 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Changes the application of specified provisions concerning stormwater management in the area served by the Northeastern Illinois Planning Commission to those located in the area served by the Chicago Metropolitan Agency for Planning. Authorizes counties containing all or a part of an urbanized area (rather than only 9 specified counties) to adopt stormwater management plans by referendum. Requires a county to adopt and enforce a floodplain management ordinance or a stormwater management ordinance that has been approved by the Office of Water Resources of the Department of Natural Resources and designate a Certified Floodplain Manager before the county may submit a referendum question to the electors for an annual tax. Prohibits a county from levying the tax if they are not in full compliance with specified provisions. Provides for specified special districts to be represented on the stormwater management planning committee in specified counties. Provides that a county's minimum standards for floodplain and stormwater management should have an emphasis on the use of cost-effective solutions to flooding problems. Provides that the stormwater management plans shall evaluate flooding problems caused by urban flooding. Defines "urban flooding". Provides that a stormwater management planning committee may make grants to units of local government, not-for-profit organization, and landowners under specified conditions. Provides that a municipality receiving grant moneys must have adopted an ordinance requiring actions consistent with the stormwater management plan. Makes other changes. Makes similar changes to provisions regarding DuPage and Peoria counties.
Title
COUNTY STORMWATER MANAGEMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0758 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-003-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1062.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1062.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |