IL HB4748 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Changes the application of specified provisions concerning stormwater management in the area served by the Northeastern Illinois Planning Commission to those located in the area served by the Chicago Metropolitan Agency for Planning. Authorizes counties containing all or a part of an urbanized area (rather than only 9 specified counties) to adopt stormwater management plans by referendum. Requires a county to adopt and enforce a floodplain management ordinance or a stormwater management ordinance that has been approved by the Office of Water Resources of the Department of Natural Resources and designate a Certified Floodplain Manager before the county may submit a referendum question to the electors for an annual tax. Prohibits a county from levying the tax if they are not in full compliance with specified provisions. Provides for specified special districts to be represented on the stormwater management planning committee in specified counties. Provides that a county's minimum standards for floodplain and stormwater management should have an emphasis on the use of cost-effective solutions to flooding problems. Provides that the stormwater management plans shall evaluate flooding problems caused by urban flooding. Defines "urban flooding". Provides that a stormwater management planning committee may make grants to units of local government, not-for-profit organization, and landowners under specified conditions. Provides that a municipality receiving grant moneys must have adopted an ordinance requiring actions consistent with the stormwater management plan. Makes other changes. Makes similar changes to provisions regarding DuPage and Peoria counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTY STORMWATER MANAGEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-003-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-1062Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1062.2Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1062.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback