IL HB4747 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Digital Fair Repair Act. Provides that original equipment manufacturers shall: (i) make available to any independent repair provider or owner of equipment manufactured by the original equipment manufacturer the same diagnostic and repair documentation in the same manner as that information is made available to the manufacturer's authorized repair providers; and (ii) make available for purchase by the owner, his or her authorized agent, or any independent repair provider, parts, inclusive of any updates to the embedded software of the parts, upon fair and reasonable terms. Requires original equipment manufacturers to make available for purchase by owners and independent repair providers all diagnostic repair tools incorporating the same diagnostic, repair, and remote communications capabilities that the original equipment manufacturer makes available to its own repair or engineering staff or an authorized repair provider. Requires an independent repair provider that purchases or acquires embedded software or service parts to notify the owner of the equipment in writing of certain warranties prior to performing any services on digital electronic equipment. Provides, with one exception, an authorized provider shall have all the rights and remedies provided under the Act. Provides for enforcement by the Attorney General. Authorizes the Attorney General to seek to enjoin violations and to recover civil penalties. Requires the Attorney General to establish an outreach program to inform the public of rights under the Act. Defines terms. Excludes motor vehicle manufacturers. Provides for recovery of damages and attorney's fees. Provides for the protection of trade secrets. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
DIGITAL FAIR REPAIR ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 004-001-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 064-049-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Consumer Protection Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |