IL HB4747 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Digital Fair Repair Act. Provides that original equipment manufacturers shall: (i) make available to any independent repair provider or owner of equipment manufactured by the original equipment manufacturer the same diagnostic and repair documentation in the same manner as that information is made available to the manufacturer's authorized repair providers; and (ii) make available for purchase by the owner, his or her authorized agent, or any independent repair provider, parts, inclusive of any updates to the embedded software of the parts, upon fair and reasonable terms. Requires original equipment manufacturers to make available for purchase by owners and independent repair providers all diagnostic repair tools incorporating the same diagnostic, repair, and remote communications capabilities that the original equipment manufacturer makes available to its own repair or engineering staff or an authorized repair provider. Requires an independent repair provider that purchases or acquires embedded software or service parts to notify the owner of the equipment in writing of certain warranties prior to performing any services on digital electronic equipment. Provides, with one exception, an authorized provider shall have all the rights and remedies provided under the Act. Provides for enforcement by the Attorney General. Authorizes the Attorney General to seek to enjoin violations and to recover civil penalties. Requires the Attorney General to establish an outreach program to inform the public of rights under the Act. Defines terms. Excludes motor vehicle manufacturers. Provides for recovery of damages and attorney's fees. Provides for the protection of trade secrets. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DIGITAL FAIR REPAIR ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 004-001-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-10HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Consumer Protection Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-10HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback