IL HB4746 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Provides that the date of renewal for a license is December 1st (rather than December 15th). Amends the Payday Loan Reform Act. Provides that the date of renewal for a license is December 1 (rather than December 31). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSUMER/PAYDAY LOAN-LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-04-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-13SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-13HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 008-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056708Amended CodeCitation Text
8151223-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback