IL HB4745 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0757
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Code shall not apply to, among other subjects, contracts for services, information technology (IT) purchases, commodities, and equipment to support the delivery of timely newborn screening services provided by the Department of Public Health, including, but not limited to, laboratory tests, such as genetic and metabolic newborn screening tests, in relation to matters involving the protection of the long-term health, life, and safety of the citizens of Illinois. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT CD-EXEMPTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0757
2018-08-10HouseEffective Date August 10, 2018
2018-08-10HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305001-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback