IL HB4743 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Provides that no employer may discriminate between employees by paying wages to an African-American employee at a rate less than the rate at which the employer pays wages to another employee who is not African-American for the same or substantially similar work on a job that requires equal skill, effort, and responsibility and is performed under similar working conditions. Sets forth exceptions,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EQUAL PAY AFRICAN AMERICANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 30 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 015-001-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-011-000
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-003-000
2018-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82011210Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback