IL HB4742 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, by January 1, 2019, the State Board of Education shall implement a program and adopt rules to allow school districts to supplement their substitute teacher recruitment for elementary and secondary schools with the use of recruiting firms. Defines "recruiting firm". Specifies program requirements. Prohibits school districts from using recruiting firms to circumvent collective bargaining agreements or laws. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the term "teacher" or "substitute teacher" does not include and service credit may not be granted to an individual employed by an entity that provides substitute teaching services under the program and is not a school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-THIRD PARTY SUB TEACHER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-009-009
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-106.3Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-127Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback