IL HB4742 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 8:30 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, by January 1, 2019, the State Board of Education shall implement a program and adopt rules to allow school districts to supplement their substitute teacher recruitment for elementary and secondary schools with the use of recruiting firms. Defines "recruiting firm". Specifies program requirements. Prohibits school districts from using recruiting firms to circumvent collective bargaining agreements or laws. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the term "teacher" or "substitute teacher" does not include and service credit may not be granted to an individual employed by an entity that provides substitute teaching services under the program and is not a school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-THIRD PARTY SUB TEACHER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-106.3Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-127Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback