IL HB4741 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that each committed person is entitled to 30 visits per month. Provides that every committed person may submit a list of at least 50 persons to the Department of Corrections that are authorized to visit the committed person. Provides that the list shall be kept in an electronic format by the Department as well as available in paper form for Department employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CORRECTIONS-VISIT POLICY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0677
2018-08-03HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-7-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback